Senate | 04/20/2023 | Approved by Governor 04/20/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Stewart |