Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB776 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023