Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB782 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023