Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB813 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023