Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB847 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023