Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB944 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 03/02/2023

                             
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB944 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
March 1, 2023 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
SENATE BILL NO. 944 	By: Pugh of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Hilbert of the House 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Semiquincentennial of the 
United States; creating the Oklahoma 
Semiquincentennial Commission; providing sunset date; 
providing for duties of the Commission; providing for 
membership; providing deadline for appointments and 
first meeting; providing for staffing; declaring 
quorum; allowing tra vel expense reimbursement; 
declaring certain authorization; requiring report; 
creating the Semiquincentennial Revolving Fund; 
providing sunset date; transferring remaining monies 
after sunset date; providing for codification; and 
declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF TH E STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 500 of Title 53, unless there is 
created a duplication in numbering, reads as fo llows: 
A.  There is hereby created the Oklahoma Semiquincentennial 
Commission until June 30, 2027. 
B.  The duties of the Commission shall be as follows: 
1.  Be the point of contact for state and national organizations 
and events related to the Semiquincentennial of the United State s;   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB944 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  Develop programs and plans for the official observance of 
the 250th anniversary of the founding of the United States in 2026, 
as marked by the Declaration of Independence in 1776 ; and 
3.  Cooperate with the United States Semiquincentennial 
Commission and various state agencies, boards, commissions, 
departments, and political subdivisions in order to execute 
commemorative events and to implement educational activities , 
events, and celebrations related to the Semi quincentennial of the 
United States. 
C. The Commission shall be composed of twenty-five (25) 
members.  The members shall serve as follows: 
1.  Five members appointed by the Governor as follows: 
a. one who shall be a member with experience in the study 
and documentation of the history of Latino communities 
in Oklahoma, 
b. one who shall be a member with experience in the study 
and documentation of the history of Black communities 
in Oklahoma, 
c. one who shall be a member with experience in the study 
and documentation of the history of American Indian 
communities in Oklahoma, 
d. one who shall be a current fifth-grade teacher 
currently certified to teach in Oklahoma with 
experience teaching United States history , and   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB944 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
e. one who shall be a secondary teacher currently 
certified to teach United States history in Okla homa; 
2.  Five members shall be appointed by the Speaker of the House 
of Representatives, one appointee from each of the five 
congressional districts; 
3.  Five members shall be appointed by the President Pro Tem pore 
of the Senate, one appointee from each of the five congressional 
districts; and 
4.  Nine voting ex officio members shall be appointed as 
follows: 
a. the Lieutenant Governor, or designee, who shall serve 
as chair, 
b. the Executive Director of the Oklahoma Historical 
Society, or designee, who shall serve as vice chair, 
c. the Director of the Oklahoma Department of Commerce, 
or designee, 
d. the Superintendent of Public Instruction, or designee , 
e. the Chancellor of the State Regents for Higher 
Education, or designee , 
f. the Executive Director of the Oklahoma Arts Council, 
or designee, 
g. the Executive Director of the O klahoma Tourism and 
Recreation Department, or designee, 
h. the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court, or designee ,   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB944 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
i. the Regent of the Oklahoma Society Daughters of the 
American Revolution, and 
j. the President of the Oklahoma Socie ty of the Sons of 
the American Revolution. 
D.  Commission members may be removed for cause.  Whenever a 
vacancy on the Commission o ccurs by death, resignation, or 
otherwise, the appointing authority shall fill t he same by 
appointment, and the appointee shall hold office during the 
unexpired term.  Each member shall hold office until a successor has 
been appointed. 
E.  All appointments to the Commission shall be made no l ater 
than August 1, 2023.  The Commission shall hold its first meeting no 
later than September 1, 2023.  The Commission shall be staffed by 
the Oklahoma Historical Society.  All appropriate agencies of state 
government shall provide assistance to the Commi ssion upon request 
of the Commission. 
F.  A quorum of thirteen members shall be required to conduct 
official business of the Commission.  The Commission may establish 
subcommittees to effectuate the purpose of the Commission.  The 
Commission shall meet as oft en as necessary to perform its duties. 
G.  Members of the Commission shall receive no compensation for 
serving on the Commission but shall receive travel reimbursement for 
necessary travel expenses incurred in the performance of their   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB944 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
duties by their respe ctive agencies in accordance with the State 
Travel Reimbursement Act. 
H.  The Commission shall be authorized to: 
a. employ personnel, 
b. contract for services, and 
c. accept gifts, grants, and donations which shall be 
deposited into the Semiquincentennial Revolving Fund, 
created in Section 2 of thi s act. 
I.  On or after June 30, 2027, any remaining supplies or 
property of the Commission shall transfer to the Oklahoma Historical 
Society. 
J.  No later than March 1, 2024, the Com mission shall 
electronically submit a report to the Governor, President Pr o 
Tempore of the Senate, and the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives to include the following information: 
1.  Mission statement of the Commission; 
2.  Goals of the Commission; 
3.  List of proposed activities; 
4.  List of milestones along with appli cable dates for executing 
the proposed activities; and 
5.  Projected budget for planned activities and private 
fundraising goals.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB944 SFLR 	Page 6 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.    NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 501 of Title 53, unless there is 
created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
There is hereby created in the State Treasury a revolving fund 
for the Oklahoma Historical Society to be designated the 
“Semiquincentennial Revolving Fund”.  The fund shall be a con tinuing 
fund, not subject to fiscal year limitations, and shall consist of 
all monies received from legislative appropriations, private 
donations, gifts, and grants. All monies accruing to the credit of 
the fund are hereby appropriated and may be budgeted and expended by 
the Oklahoma Semiquincentennial Commission for the purposes of the 
Commission. Expenditures from the fund shall be made upon warrants 
issued by the State Treasurer against claims filed as pre scribed by 
law with the Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise 
Services for approval and payment.  The Semiquincentennial Revolving 
Fund shall sunset on June 30, 2027.  Any remaining monies in the 
fund shall transfer to the Historical Society Re volving Fund, 
created in Section 1.10 of Titl e 53 of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof t his act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
March 1, 2023 - DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS