Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB951 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023