House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Daniels |