Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Floyd; authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Deck
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Floyd, Howard, Gollihare, Standridge, Jech, Hall, Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Swope
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|