Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB993 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023