House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Authored by Senator Hamilton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative West (Rick)
|
|
|