Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Gollihare, Bullard, Pederson, Stephens, Garvin, Dugger, Matthews
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed, Sims
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Lawson
|
|
|