House
|
04/24/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Floyd; authored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Returned to General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson, Martinez, Stinson, Pae
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 79 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Talley
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 43
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Floyd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron, Lepak, Hefner, Dollens, Townley
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Munson, Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Talley
|
|
|