Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1028 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill March 21, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2023