House
|
05/02/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Munson
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Talley
|
|
|