Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1029 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2023