Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Ranson
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 25
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck, Menz
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Waldron, Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Remove Representative Rosecrants as principal House author and substitute with Representative Randleman
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|