Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1041 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023