House
|
05/22/2024
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Kidd, Rader, Howard, Daniels, Rosino, Kirt
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Lawson
|
|
|