Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024