Senate | 04/10/2023 | Failed in Committee - Finance | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Authored by Senator Alvord (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Smith |