House
|
05/30/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/31/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Ayes: 36 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 21; Ayes: 72 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Daniels, Garvin, Stewart, Bergstrom, Hamilton, Young
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|