House
|
04/19/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/19/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|