Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2023