Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 11 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative McCall |