House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overrride failed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 61
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Vetoed 05/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|