Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1236 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023