Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1331 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 25, 2023