Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1345 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill February 16, 2023