House
|
05/20/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 9
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|