Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 8, 2023