Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |