Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pittman | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 7 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Boatman |