House
|
05/01/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/01/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Talley
|
|
|