Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1382 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2024