House
|
05/30/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/05/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 40; Ayes: 51 Nays: 40
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Hamilton
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin), Wolfley, Conley, Hill
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Remove Representative Vancuren as principal House author and substitute with Representative Staires
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Stanley; authored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Vancuren
|
|
|