Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1425 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 2, 2024