House
|
05/30/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/31/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker, McDugle, Hill
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, CrosswhiteHader, Townley, Roe
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|