Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023