House
|
04/16/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/16/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Sneed
|
|
|