Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1505 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 11, 2024

Amended

Bill March 27, 2024
Bill February 25, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2024