House
|
05/16/2024
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Bullard, Pemberton, Jett, Coleman, Garvin, Young
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman, Sneed, Sterling
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Remove Representative Sneed as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sims
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Sneed
|
|
|