Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1522 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 25, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024