House | 02/22/2024 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Remove Representative Sneed as principal House author and substitute with Representative Olsen | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Sneed | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |