House
|
04/29/2024
|
Vetoed 04/29/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Moore
|
|
|