LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1589
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma House Bill HB1589
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session
Oklahoma House Bill HB1589
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 18, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 8, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 18, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 11, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 16, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
February 15, 2023
Compare