House
|
05/30/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Remove Senator Montgomery as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Coleman
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Remove Representative Martinez as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kannady
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
HC's named: GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Montgomery, Coleman, Burns, Haste, Jett, Newhouse, Young
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 20
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 33
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Martinez
|
|
|