Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1600 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2024
Bill February 20, 2023