Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Echols
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from State Powers Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to State Powers
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Lepak
|
|
|