House
|
05/15/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/15/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Staires
|
|
|